IN HB1017 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Representative Davis appointed as House advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Representative Davis appointed as House advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Farm wineries.
Title
Farm wineries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Representative Davis appointed as House advisor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Steele, Randolph and Glick |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Alting and Arnold |
2013-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: Lucas, Bacon, Austin and Macer |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Koch and GiaQuinta |
2013-04-11 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 417: yeas 47 and nays 3 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as cosponsor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2013-02-12 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Alting, Steele and Glick |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 106: yeas 89, nays 8 |
2013-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-17 | House | Representative Bacon added as coauthor |
2013-01-14 | House | Representatives Austin and Lucas added as coauthors |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Koch |