IN HB1016 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 173: yeas 47, nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 173: yeas 47, nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Student journalism. Provides freedom of speech and freedom of press protections for grades 7 through 12 and state educational institution student journalists. Requires each school corporation and charter school to adopt a policy concerning student journalist protections. Requires a student media adviser to, each school year, supervise student journalists in grades 7 through 12 in the creation of certain school sponsored media policies. Provides that a public school or school corporation may not suppress school sponsored media unless certain conditions apply. Provides that public schools, school corporations, and state educational institutions are immune from civil liability for any injury resulting
Title
Student journalism. Provides freedom of speech and freedom of press protections for grades 7 through 12 and state educational institution student journalists. Requires each school corporation and charter school to adopt a policy concerning student journalist protections. Requires a student media adviser to, each school year, supervise student journalists in grades 7 through 12 in the creation of certain school sponsored media policies. Provides that a public school or school corporation may not suppress school sponsored media unless certain conditions apply. Provides that public schools, school corporations, and state educational institutions are immune from civil liability for any injury resulting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 173: yeas 47, nays 46 |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #2 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative DeLaney |
2018-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |