IN HB1014 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State museum and historic sites corporation. Specifies that a memorandum of understanding between the chief executive officer of the Indiana state museum and historic sites corporation (corporation) and a nonprofit organization that supports a specific state historic site may not include certain restrictions on the fundraising activities of the nonprofit organization and certain operations of the nonprofit organization. Requires the corporation to return certain donor restricted funds to a nonprofit organization if the funds are not used for a donor's specified use in a historic site project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State museum and historic sites corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 167
2020-03-25HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 367: yeas 84, nays 5
2020-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 366: yeas 44, nays 5
2020-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-10SenateSenator Buck added as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Lanane removed as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Buck removed as advisor
2020-03-04SenateSenate advisors appointed: Buck and Taylor G
2020-03-04SenateSenate conferees appointed: Gaskill and Lanane
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Saunders, Abbott, Chyung and Pryor
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lehe and Klinker
2020-03-03HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-03HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 45, nays 1
2020-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-20SenateSenator Niemeyer added as second sponsor
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-15HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-14HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Gaskill
2020-01-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 96, nays 0
2020-01-13HouseRepresentatives Cherry and Klinker added as coauthors
2020-01-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Saunders

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1014/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/3/0/6c306e91/HB1014.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/c/3/c9c32415/HB1014.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/c/2/88c2c2f9/HB1014.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/0/4/29041a2c/HB1014.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/4/8/2648ba03/HB1014.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/f/a/36fa0180/HB1014.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/7/1/7371a58f/HB1014.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/9/f/5e9f4e8b/HB1014.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/c/9/54c9f57b/HB1014.21_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/a/3/bfa38c9c/HB1014.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/5/e/f05eb11e/HB1014.235_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/c/b/afcbfe41/HB1014.366_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/6/1/a461caa4/HB1014.367_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback