IN HB1011 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 212
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Public mass transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public mass transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Bauer), failed (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 212
2013-05-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-26HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 634: yeas 59, nays 35
2013-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: M. Young, Taylor, Merritt and Waltz
2013-04-18SenateSenate conferee appointed: Pat Miller and Breaux
2013-04-17HouseHouse advisors appointed: T. Brown, Pryor and Hale
2013-04-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Torr and Porter
2013-04-15HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2013-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 415: yeas 39 and nays 11
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 3 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 1 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-04SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-04-02SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2013-03-14SenateSenator Kenley removed as second sponsor
2013-02-27SenateSenator Crider added as cosponsor
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2013-02-25HouseCosponsor: Senator Taylor
2013-02-25HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Pat Miller, Kenley and Merritt
2013-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 56, nays 39
2013-02-20HouseAmendment 2 (Bauer), failed; Roll Call 171: yeas 30, nays 67
2013-02-20HouseAmendment 1 (Pryor), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-20HouseAmendment 3 (Thompson), failed; voice vote
2013-02-20HouseAmendment 4 (Turner), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-20HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2013-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-29HouseRepresentatives Braun, Huston and Forestal added as coauthors
2013-01-29HouseHouse Rule 105.1 suspended
2013-01-28HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2013-01-28HouseHouse Rule 105.1 suspended
2013-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2013-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Kirchhofer, Porter and Pryor
2013-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1011
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN1011.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1011.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1011.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1011.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1011.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1011.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1011.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HE/HE1011.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0171.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0242.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0415.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0634.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback