IN HB1010 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
211 dialing code for human services information. Amends the statute concerning the telephone 211 dialing code for human services information to add assistance concerning: (1) domestic violence; (2) infant mortality; (3) veterans; (4) senior citizens; (5) vulnerable children; and (6) public health; to the enumerated services included within the term "human services". Requires the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to consult with the board of directors of Indiana 211 Partnership, Inc., in preparing the required annual plan for the expenditure of the money in the 211 services account (account). Provides that the plan must include a strategy or plan to address
Title
211 dialing code for human services information. Amends the statute concerning the telephone 211 dialing code for human services information to add assistance concerning: (1) domestic violence; (2) infant mortality; (3) veterans; (4) senior citizens; (5) vulnerable children; and (6) public health; to the enumerated services included within the term "human services". Requires the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to consult with the board of directors of Indiana 211 Partnership, Inc., in preparing the required annual plan for the expenditure of the money in the 211 services account (account). Provides that the plan must include a strategy or plan to address
Sponsors
Rep. Judson McMillin [R] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Scott Pelath [D] |
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Merritt added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment #1 (McMillin) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | Representative Pelath added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative Frizzell added as coauthor |
2015-01-15 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2015-01-15 | House | Representative Olthoff added as coauthor |
2015-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative McMillin |