IN HB1009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher residency grant pilot program. Establishes the: (1) teacher residency grant pilot program (pilot program); and (2) teacher residency grant pilot program fund. Requires the commission for higher education (commission) to administer the pilot program. Provides that the commission may award grants to school corporations and charter schools that: (1) apply to participate in the pilot program; (2) partner with one approved postsecondary educational institution to establish and implement a teacher residency program (program); (3) submit a teacher residency plan that establishes a program that meets certain requirements; and (4) provide other information required by the commission. Provides that a school corporation or charter school that is awarded a grant under the pilot program: (1) shall provide stipends to program participants and teachers who act as mentors to program participants; and (2) may use money from the grant award to pay the approved postsecondary educational institution with which the school corporation or charter school has partnered for administrative costs incurred by the approved postsecondary educational institution in developing and implementing the program. Requires the commission to submit a report regarding the pilot program and the retention and performance of program participants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher residency grant pilot program. Establishes the: (1) teacher residency grant pilot program (pilot program); and (2) teacher residency grant pilot program fund. Requires the commission for higher education (commission) to administer the pilot program. Provides that the commission may award grants to school corporations and charter schools that: (1) apply to participate in the pilot program; (2) partner with one approved postsecondary educational institution to establish and implement a teacher residency program (program); (3) submit a teacher residency plan that establishes a program that meets certain requirements; and (4) provide other information required by the commission. Provides that a school corporation or charter school that is awarded a grant under the pilot program: (1) shall provide stipends to program participants and teachers who act as mentors to program participants; and (2) may use money from the grant award to pay the approved postsecondary educational institution with which the school corporation or charter school has partnered for administrative costs incurred by the approved postsecondary educational institution in developing and implementing the program. Requires the commission to submit a report regarding the pilot program and the retention and performance of program participants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 74
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 457: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-20SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 278: yeas 37, nays 11
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-11SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Kruse and Lanane
2019-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseRepresentatives Moed and Cook added as coauthors
2019-01-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-10HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative DeVon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1009/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/8/2/8282b1ef/HB1009.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/5/3/48539572/HB1009.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/9/1/9e917e99/HB1009.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/2/3/5f238796/HB1009.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/a/e/cbaef547/HB1009.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/1/7/1d17317c/HB1009.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/c/c/46ccf7ce/HB1009.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/2/0/43206916/HB1009.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/0/4/a5048bc9/HB1009.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/8/d/228d0a1a/HB1009.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/d/3/fcd34c70/HB1009.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/e/c/01ec66bf/HB1009.45.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/b/1/87b1612c/HB1009.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/e/c/94ecb769/HB1009.278.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/b/b/1dbb264b/HB1009.457.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback