IN HB1009 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Technical corrections bill. Resolves: (1) technical conflicts between differing 2011 amendments to Indiana Code sections; and (2) other technical problems in the Indiana Code, including incorrect statutory references, nonstandard tabulation, grammatical problems, and misspellings. Makes technical corrections and conforming amendments, as required by P.L.229-2011, SECTION 285, related to the repeal and enactment in 2011 of laws concerning the state civil service system. Repeals provisions made obsolete by the 2011 changes in the state civil service system laws.
Title
Technical corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-02-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-14 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-27 | Cosponsor: Senator Taylor | |
2012-01-27 | Senate sponsors: Senators M. Young, Banks and Arnold | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 90, nays 2 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-12 | Representatives McMillin, Bartlett and VanDenburgh added as coauthors | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Foley |