IN HB1008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher career ladders. Makes changes to the requirements necessary for a school corporation to receive a grant from the teacher and student advancement grant program (program). Provides that charter schools may receive grants under the program. Provides that not later than July 1, 2020, and each July 1 thereafter, the department shall submit a report to the governor and the general assembly regarding the program. Repeals provisions relating to the career pathways and mentorship program. Repeals provisions relating to the Indiana new educator induction pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher career ladders. Makes changes to the requirements necessary for a school corporation to receive a grant from the teacher and student advancement grant program (program). Provides that charter schools may receive grants under the program. Provides that not later than July 1, 2020, and each July 1 thereafter, the department shall submit a report to the governor and the general assembly regarding the program. Repeals provisions relating to the career pathways and mentorship program. Repeals provisions relating to the Indiana new educator induction pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 73
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 419: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-14SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2019-03-14SenateSenator Raatz added as second sponsor
2019-03-14SenateSenator Kruse removed as second sponsor
2019-03-14SenateSenator Crane added as sponsor
2019-03-14SenateSenator Raatz removed as sponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Kruse and Melton
2019-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-01-24HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) motion withdrawn
2019-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15HouseRepresentatives Cook and Lauer added as coauthors
2019-01-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-10HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2019-01-10HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1008/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/3/6/7b36ee6b/HB1008.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/6/1/81611c23/HB1008.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/d/2/dad280c4/HB1008.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/0/f/500f7b9c/HB1008.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/c/d/d3cd73b9/HB1008.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/b/c/04bc2081/HB1008.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/4/2/02421696/HB1008.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/f/8/4ef8fcb0/HB1008.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/e/5/74e5c089/HB1008.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/d/6/40d6e97d/HB1008.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/9/3/3f93a8ad/HB1008.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/f/9/b5f9e9b6/HB1008.44.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/3/4/4534b3ec/HB1008.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/2/2/412227f9/HB1008.419.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback