IN HB1006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of child services. Provides that an older youth who received foster care is eligible to receive collaborative care services until the individual becomes 21 years of age. Provides that the caseload of a family case manager may not be more than: (1) 12 active cases relating to initial assessments; (2) 12 families in active cases relating to ongoing in-home services; or (3) 13 children in active cases relating to ongoing services who are in out-of-home placements. Requires the department of child services (department) to initiate an assessment immediately, but not later than two hours (rather than one hour, under current law), after receiving a report of child abuse or neglect if the department believes the child is in immediate danger of serious bodily harm. Requires the department to provide a report concerning an assessment or investigation of a report of suspected child abuse or neglect not later than 45 days after the department initiates the assessment if the report of suspected child abuse or neglect was received from certain entities. Provides that a child is a child in need of services if the child's parent, guardian, or custodian has failed to supply the child with necessary food, clothing, shelter, medical care, education, or supervision: (1) when the parent, guardian, or custodian is financially able to do so; or (2) due to the failure, refusal, or inability of the parent, guardian, or custodian to seek financial or other reasonable means to do so. (Current code does not consider financial ability.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of child services. Provides that an older youth who received foster care is eligible to receive collaborative care services until the individual becomes 21 years of age. Provides that the caseload of a family case manager may not be more than: (1) 12 active cases relating to initial assessments; (2) 12 families in active cases relating to ongoing in-home services; or (3) 13 children in active cases relating to ongoing services who are in out-of-home placements. Requires the department of child services (department) to initiate an assessment immediately, but not later than two hours (rather than one hour, under current law), after receiving a report of child abuse or neglect if the department believes the child is in immediate danger of serious bodily harm. Requires the department to provide a report concerning an assessment or investigation of a report of suspected child abuse or neglect not later than 45 days after the department initiates the assessment if the report of suspected child abuse or neglect was received from certain entities. Provides that a child is a child in need of services if the child's parent, guardian, or custodian has failed to supply the child with necessary food, clothing, shelter, medical care, education, or supervision: (1) when the parent, guardian, or custodian is financially able to do so; or (2) due to the failure, refusal, or inability of the parent, guardian, or custodian to seek financial or other reasonable means to do so. (Current code does not consider financial ability.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Third reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - Amendment #1 (Hatfield) failed (Y: 25 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 198
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-12SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-04-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 437: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateSenator Breaux added as cosponsor
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-25SenateSenator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
2019-03-25SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2019-03-25SenateSenator Crane added as cosponsor
2019-03-25SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-22HouseRepresentatives Engleman, DeLaney, Bauer added as coauthors
2019-01-22HouseCosponsor: Senator Randolph
2019-01-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Houchin, Holdman and Taylor G
2019-01-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 100, nays 0
2019-01-17HouseAmendment #1 (Hatfield) failed; Roll Call 14: yeas 25, nays 65
2019-01-17HouseAmendment #2 (DeLaney) ruled out of order
2019-01-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-15HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Steuerwald

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1006/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/f/6/dff65b02/HB1006.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/6/4/97646af3/HB1006.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/c/a/70ca4672/HB1006.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/0/b/990bd9c1/HB1006.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/7/5/96759308/HB1006.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/f/4/ccf40f68/HB1006.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/0/f/fa0fbdc0/HB1006.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/4/3/7a430c65/HB1006.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/1/0/42104992/HB1006.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/9/6/0996a097/HB1006.14.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/8/c/608c8fa2/HB1006.18.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/8/9/218909d5/HB1006.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/2/b/4a2b7d06/HB1006.03.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/e/f/e4ef1c79/HB1006.437.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback