IN HB1005 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senator Raatz added as cosponsor
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

School choice matters. Establishes the Indiana education scholarship account program (program). Provides that, after June 30, 2022, a parent of an eligible student or an emancipated eligible student may establish an account in the program. Defines an eligible student as: (1) a student with a disability who requires special education; (2) a student with a parent who is on active duty service in the armed forces of the United States or national guard; or (3) a student placed in foster care or otherwise under care and supervision of the department of child services. Provides that an eligible student who has an account and attends a qualified school is eligible to receive an annual grant amount that may be used to pay for tuition at an accredited nonpublic school or education related expenses. Provides that the treasurer of state shall administer the program. Provides a deduction from Indiana adjusted gross income for a grant amount that is distributed to a taxpayer's Indiana education savings account and used for a qualified expense, to the extent the distribution is included in the taxpayer's federal adjusted gross income. Changes the eligibility requirements to receive choice scholarships. Makes changes to the amount of tuition an eligible choice scholarship student is entitled to receive to attend a choice scholarship school. Establishes the Indiana education scholarship account program advisory council to provide guidance on the implementation of the program as well as to provide recommendation for program improvements to the treasurer of state and to the general assembly. Repeals provisions that provide eligibility to certain students if the student's household income increases. Provides that the department of education shall provide services that offer objective advise upon request to parents of an eligible student or an emancipated eligible student relating to services that can help meet the eligible student's or emancipated eligible student's particular needs. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School choice matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08SenateSenator Raatz added as cosponsor
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-02-17HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-16HouseCosponsor: Senator Brown L
2021-02-16HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Buchanan, Messmer, Bassler
2021-02-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 61, nays 38
2021-02-15HouseAmendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 119: yeas 28, nays 63
2021-02-15HouseAmendment #2 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-08HouseRepresentative Lauer added as coauthor
2021-02-04HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Clere and Prescott
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1005/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/9/e/489e153f/HB1005.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/c/9/e8c9147d/HB1005.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/6/3/e1638ce2/HB1005.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/0/e/c70e195c/HB1005.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/c/8/92c87ce5/HB1005.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/e/0/74e0b50f/HB1005.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/1/2/4f122317/HB1005.04.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/5/a/5d5ae341/HB1005.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/3/b/1b3b9057/HB1005.03.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/4/c/e24c43a8/HB1005.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/0/2/1902b572/HB1005.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/2/3/c823daf3/HB1005.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/2/d/822d86e2/HB1005.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/b/8/76b84945/HB1005.02.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/0/5/420544b1/HB1005.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/6/d/7d6d32b0/HB1005.04.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/0/3/45038d3e/HB1005.04.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/f/6/f0f61073/HB1005.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/7/c/9b7c5cda/HB1005.02.COMH.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/4/4/3a442df0/HB1005.119_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/5/5/3555294a/HB1005.134_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback