IN HB1005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Superintendent of public instruction. Abolishes the office of the state superintendent of public instruction on January 10, 2025. Provides that, after January 10, 2025, the governor shall appoint a secretary of education. Establishes residency, education, and experience qualifications for the secretary of education. Makes conforming and technical amendments.
Title
Superintendent of public instruction. Abolishes the office of the state superintendent of public instruction on January 10, 2025. Provides that, after January 10, 2025, the governor shall appoint a secretary of education. Establishes residency, education, and experience qualifications for the secretary of education. Makes conforming and technical amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Bosma [R] | Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Breaux) failed (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Pelath) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Breaux) failed (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Pelath) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Public Law 219 |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 493: yeas 66, nays 31 |
2017-04-17 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 363: yeas 28, nays 20 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Breaux) failed; voice vote |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 322: yeas 9, nays 40 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Buck and Hershman |
2017-02-20 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2017-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 68, nays 29 |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 131: yeas 28, nays 62 |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment #2 (Pelath) failed; Roll Call 130: yeas 28, nays 62 |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Ober and Wesco |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Bosma |