IN HB1005 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective retroactive to 01/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective retroactive to 01/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain changes to the industrial recovery tax credit (credit). Reduces, for purposes of qualifying for the credit: (1) the number of years, from 20 to 15, in which a vacant industrial facility must have been in service; and (2) from two years to one year the time that a facility must be vacant. Reduces the minimum amount of floor space that a vacant industrial facility may have to qualify for the credit from 250,000 square feet to: (1) 50,000 square feet, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2010, and beginning before January 1, 2015; or (2) 100,000 square feet, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Title
Industrial recovery tax credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Bosma [R] | Rep. Dave Cheatham [D] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. David Yarde [R] |
Rep. David Yarde [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Battles), failed (Y: 37 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Battles), failed (Y: 37 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective retroactive to 01/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 113 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 493: yeas 48, nays 0 | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 695: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Hershman, Randolph and Grooms | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Arnold | |
2011-04-21 | House advisors appointed: Ellspermann, Espich and Battles | |
2011-04-21 | House conferees appointed: Clere and Cheatham | |
2011-04-20 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 395: yeas 47 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-03 | Senator Tomes added as cosponsor | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2011-02-15 | Cosponsor: Senator Grooms | |
2011-02-15 | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau, Hershman and Arnold | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2011-02-14 | Amendment 1 (Battles), failed; Roll Call 138: yeas 37, nays 53 | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Representative Cheatham added as coauthor | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development | |
2011-01-12 | Coauthored by Representatives Bosma and Yarde | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Clere |