IN HB1004 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small business restart grant program. Establishes the Hoosier hospitality small business restart grant program (program) to provide grants to eligible entities to accelerate economic recovery from the impacts of the coronavirus disease (COVID-19) pandemic. Establishes the small business restart grant fund (fund). Provides that the Indiana economic development corporation (corporation) administers the program and fund. Allows the corporation to award grants from the fund. Provides parameters for the program. However, authorizes the corporation to change the parameters of the program, which, if a change is made, must be reviewed by the budget committee at the meeting following the change. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Small business restart grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Moed) failed (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Moed) failed (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Public Law 82 |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 348: yeas 94, nays 3 |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senator Garten added as cosponsor |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as cosponsor |
2021-02-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | Representative Pryor added as coauthor |
2021-02-02 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Mishler, Messmer, Holdman |
2021-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 93, nays 3 |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment #3 (Moed) failed; Roll Call 16: yeas 30, nays 67 |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment #2 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 15: yeas 29, nays 68 |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Negele and Morrison |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Lindauer |