IN HB1004 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 188: yeas 13, nays 37
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 188: yeas 13, nays 37
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School pension plans and other education matters. Establishes the teachers' defined contribution plan (plan) as an account within the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (fund). Provides that an individual who begins employment with a school corporation in a covered position that would otherwise be eligible for membership in the fund may elect to become a member of the plan. Provides that an individual who does not elect to become a member of the plan becomes a member of the fund. Requires the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system (board) to establish, subject to any approval from the
Title
School pension plans and other education matters. Establishes the teachers' defined contribution plan (plan) as an account within the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (fund). Provides that an individual who begins employment with a school corporation in a covered position that would otherwise be eligible for membership in the fund may elect to become a member of the plan. Provides that an individual who does not elect to become a member of the plan becomes a member of the fund. Requires the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system (board) to establish, subject to any approval from the
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Howard Kenley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Becker) failed (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #7 (Austin) failed (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #6 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Behning) prevailed (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Becker) failed (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #7 (Austin) failed (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #6 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Behning) prevailed (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 188: yeas 13, nays 37 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 187: yeas 14, nays 36 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Becker) failed; Roll Call 186: yeas 20, nays 30 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-03 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Kenley |
2016-02-03 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse, Bassler, Banks |
2016-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 57, nays 42 |
2016-02-02 | House | Amendment #7 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 126: yeas 30, nays 67 |
2016-02-02 | House | Amendment #6 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 125: yeas 30, nays 67 |
2016-02-02 | House | Amendment #3 (Behning) prevailed; Roll Call 124: yeas 67, nays 30 |
2016-02-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara and Truitt |
2016-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Behning |