IN HB1004 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 267
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Early education evaluation program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early education evaluation program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-25 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House - Amendment 7 (V. Smith), failed (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - House - Amendment 3 (V. Smith), failed (Y: 28 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - House - Motion to recommit to Committee on Ways and Means (Porter) failed (Y: 28 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 267
2013-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-25HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 610: yeas 98, nays 1
2013-04-15HouseRepresentative Riecken appointed as House advisor
2013-04-09SenateSenate advisors appointed: Pete Miller, Broden and Yoder
2013-04-09SenateSenate conferee appointed: Kruse and Rogers
2013-04-09HouseHouse advisors appointed: Crouch, Huston, V. Smith and Battles
2013-04-09HouseHouse conferees appointed: Behning and VanDenburgh
2013-04-09HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2013-04-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-04-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 355: yeas 42 and nays 7
2013-04-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-26SenateSenator Broden added as third sponsor
2013-03-26SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2013-02-18HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Pete Miller
2013-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-18HouseAmendment 11 ( Behning) and prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-18HouseThird reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted; bill passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 93, nays 6
2013-02-14HouseRepresentative Bosma added as coauthor
2013-02-14HouseAmendment 7 (V. Smith), failed; Roll Call 124: yeas 26, nays 68
2013-02-14HouseAmendment 6 (V. Smith), withdrawn
2013-02-14HouseAmendment 4 (DeLaney), failed; voice vote
2013-02-14HouseAmendment 10 (Huston), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-14HouseAmendment 3 (V. Smith), failed; Roll Call 123: yeas 28, nays 69
2013-02-14HouseAmendment 9 (Crouch), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-14HouseAmendment 5 (DeLaney), failed; voice vote
2013-02-14HouseMotion to recommit to Committee on Ways and Means (Porter) failed; Roll Call 122: yeas 28, nays 67
2013-02-14HouseAmendment 8 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-05HouseRepresentative VanDenburgh added as coauthor
2013-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-01-15HouseCoauthored by Representative Crouch
2013-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1004
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN1004.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1004.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1004.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1004.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1004.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HE/HE1004.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0122.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0123.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0124.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0134.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0355.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0610.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback