IN HB1003 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-28)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Representative Sullivan removed as coauthor
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Tuition support. Establishes a definition of "virtual instruction" for purposes of determining a school corporation's basic tuition support using the average daily membership (ADM).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tuition support.

Sponsors

Rep. Harold Slager [R]Rep. Dale DeVon [R]Rep. Elizabeth Rowray [R]Rep. Jake Teshka [R]
Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D]Rep. David Abbott [R]Rep. Mike Andrade [D]Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R]
Rep. Beau Baird [R]Rep. Robert Behning [R]Rep. Bradford Barrett [R]Rep. Steve Bartels [R]
Rep. John Bartlett [D]Rep. Maureen Bauer [D]Rep. Pat Boy [D]Rep. Timothy Brown [R]
Rep. Chris Campbell [D]Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R]Rep. Robert Cherry [R]Rep. Edward Clere [R]
Rep. Anthony Cook [R]Rep. Michelle Davis [R]Rep. Steven Davisson [R]Rep. Edward DeLaney [D]
Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D]Rep. Jeff Ellington [R]Rep. Karen Engleman [R]Rep. Sue Errington [D]
Rep. Rita Fleming [D]Rep. Randall Frye [R]Rep. Mitch Gore [D]Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D]
Rep. Doug Gutwein [R]Rep. Carey Hamilton [D]Rep. Earl Harris [D]Rep. Ragen Hatcher [D]
Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D]Rep. Dave Heine [R]Rep. Matt Hostettler [R]Rep. Todd Huston [R]
Rep. Blake Johnson [D]Rep. Jack Jordan [R]Rep. Christopher Judy [R]Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R]
Rep. Joanna King [R]Rep. Ryan Lauer [R]Rep. Cindy Ledbetter [R]Rep. Matthew Lehman [R]
Rep. Daniel Leonard [R]Rep. Jim Lucas [R]Rep. Ethan Manning [R]Rep. Chris May [R]
Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R]Rep. Wendy McNamara [R]Rep. Doug Miller [R]Rep. Justin Moed [D]
Rep. Alan Morrison [R]Rep. Charles Moseley [D]Rep. Sharon Negele [R]Rep. Julie Olthoff [R]
Rep. Renee Pack [D]Rep. Zach Payne [R]Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D]Rep. Matt Pierce [D]
Rep. Jim Pressel [R]Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D]Rep. Robin Shackleford [D]Rep. Donna Schaibley [R]
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R]Rep. Craig Snow [R]Rep. Ben Smaltz [R]Rep. Vernon Smith [D]
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R]Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R]Rep. Gerald Torr [R]Rep. Heath VanNatter [R]
Rep. Timothy Wesco [R]Rep. John Young [R]Rep. Dennis Zent [R]Rep. Ann Vermilion [R]
Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R]Rep. Sheila Klinker [D]Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D]Rep. Gregory Porter [D]
Rep. John Prescott [R]Rep. Chris Jeter [R]Rep. Robert Heaton [R]Sen. Jeff Raatz [R]

Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Sullivan removed as coauthor
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-01-27HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-01-26HouseRepresentatives Austin, Abbott D, Andrade M, Aylesworth, Baird, Behning, Barrett, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer M, Boy, Brown, T., Campbell, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davis M, Davisson, DeLaney, Dvorak, Ellington, Engleman, Errington, Fleming, Frye, Gore M, GiaQuinta, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Heine, Hostettler, Huston, Johnson, Jordan, Judy, Karickhoff, King J, Lauer, Ledbetter C, Lehman, Leonard, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Miller, Moed, Morrison, Moseley, Negele, Olthoff, Pack R, Payne Z, Pfaff, Pierce, Pressel, Pryor, Shackleford, Schaibley, Soliday, Snow C, Smaltz, Smith, V., Sullivan, Steuerwald, Thompson, Torr, VanNatter, Wesco, Young J, Zent, Vermilion A, Ziemke, Klinker, Jackson, Porter, Prescott, Jeter C, Heaton added as coauthors
2021-01-26HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2021-01-26HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Raatz
2021-01-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 7: yeas 93, nays 2
2021-01-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representatives DeVon, Rowray, Teshka
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Slager

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1003/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/4/c/4d4c05a9/HB1003.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/a/6/14a68332/HB1003.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/2/2/ff22b781/HB1003.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/1/b/5a1b49fd/HB1003.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/b/2/cdb22497/HB1003.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/7/4/bf749b8d/HB1003.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/4/8/cd488369/HB1003.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/2/e/782e4c97/HB1003.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/5/1/38513331/HB1003.7_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback