IN HB1003 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining agency reporting requirements. Repeals the requirement that the office of management and budget (OMB) perform a cost benefit analysis of certain rules for the three year period following the rules' effective dates. Repeals a statute that allows: (1) state agencies to submit comments on proposed legislation to OMB; and (2) OMB to review, amend, and transmit the comments to the legislative services agency for posting on the general assembly's web site. Eliminates or consolidates various state agency reporting requirements. Repeals the following: (1) Pilot program for state registration of privately certified individuals. (2) Family support program. (3) The early
Title
Streamlining agency reporting requirements. Repeals the requirement that the office of management and budget (OMB) perform a cost benefit analysis of certain rules for the three year period following the rules' effective dates. Repeals a statute that allows: (1) state agencies to submit comments on proposed legislation to OMB; and (2) OMB to review, amend, and transmit the comments to the legislative services agency for posting on the general assembly's web site. Eliminates or consolidates various state agency reporting requirements. Repeals the following: (1) Pilot program for state registration of privately certified individuals. (2) Family support program. (3) The early
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Greg Beumer [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] | Rep. Mara Reardon [D] |
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Public Law 130 |
2018-03-16 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 321: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 46, nays 2 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bray |
2018-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 92, nays 2 |
2018-01-18 | House | Representatives Beumer, Jordan, Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors |
2018-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction |
2018-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Gutwein |