IN HB1002 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civil immunity related to COVID-19. Protects health care providers from professional discipline for certain acts or omissions arising from a disaster emergency unless the act or omission constitutes gross negligence, willful or wanton misconduct, or intentional misrepresentation. Provides that a health care provider is not protected from professional discipline for actions that are outside the skills, education, and training of the health care provider, unless certain circumstances apply. Specifies that orders and recommendations issued by local, state, and federal government agencies and officials during a state disaster emergency do not create new causes of action or new legal duties. Specifies that the orders and recommendations are presumed irrelevant to the issue of the existence of a duty or breach of a duty. Prohibits filing a class action lawsuit against a defendant in a civil action allowed by the statute. Specifies that a governmental entity or employee is not liable if a loss results from an act or omission arising from COVID-19 unless the act or omission constitutes gross negligence, willful or wanton misconduct, or intentional misrepresentation. Provides that a person is not liable to a claimant for loss, damage, injury, or death arising from COVID-19 unless the claimant proves that the person caused the loss, damage, injury, or death by an act or omission constituting gross negligence, willful or wanton misconduct, or intentional misrepresentation. Provides immunity from civil liability to certain persons, entities, and facilities providing health care and other services for certain acts or omissions related to the provision of health care services and other services during a state disaster emergency. Extends COVID-19 health care immunity during periods of disaster emergency after February 29, 2020, and before April 1, 2022. Resolves conflicts between SEA 1 and HB 1002.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil immunity related to COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 58 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 166
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 443: yeas 58, nays 21
2021-04-14HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-04-07SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-06SenateSenator Koch added as cosponsor
2021-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 349: yeas 41, nays 9
2021-04-05SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2021-04-05SenateAmendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-01HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer, Brown L, Freeman
2021-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 76, nays 21
2021-01-28HouseAmendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 11: yeas 28, nays 65
2021-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representatives Young J, Jeter, Lehman
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1002/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/7/0/e5701b8f/HB1002.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/4/b/ab4bf566/HB1002.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/7/4/43745833/HB1002.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/4/a/514a6a84/HB1002.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/f/d/92fd50c0/HB1002.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/3/b/f93bf6db/HB1002.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/e/3/52e34d78/HB1002.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/6/6/44663896/HB1002.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/4/8/124867ac/HB1002.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/e/5/c0e5282a/HB1002.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/c/6/77c6660c/HB1002.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/a/6/66a64c5d/HB1002.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/2/0/1c20ecc7/HB1002.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/e/0/f3e04027/HB1002.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/a/d/c6ad658c/HB1002.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/b/3/28b3dfc0/HB1002.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/1/8/da182d11/HB1002.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/a/e/b8aedc02/HB1002.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/e/b/d5ebbdd1/HB1002.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/9/7/d497fcbe/HB1002.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/a/3/51a3d207/HB1002.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/0/8/26088a11/HB1002.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/b/c/c5bc3e2d/HB1002.04.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/c/9/97c9a701/HB1002.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/e/4/a4e47386/HB1002.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/b/c/ccbc474f/HB1002.11_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/c/8/c5c8349b/HB1002.23_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/4/9/1049b6bb/HB1002.02.COMH.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/3/b/fd3bcd44/HB1002.349_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/f/9/51f93dcf/HB1002.443_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback