IN HB1002 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senators Lanane, Tallian, Rogers and Hume added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senators Lanane, Tallian, Rogers and Hume added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain contracts for public works projects may not be awarded to a contractor that does not: (1) employ residents of Indiana as at least 80% of the employees working on the contract; and (2) enter into subcontracts only with subcontractors that employ residents of Indiana as at least 80% of the employees working on the contract. Makes an exception for work done in response to an emergency and work done by artisans or in a speciality area with limited persons able to perform the work. Applies the preference to certain contracts entered into by the public works division of the department of administration, any state agency or commission entering into a public works contract, the commission governing the ports of Indiana, the department of transportation, and units of local government. Provides that if a contract is being paid for with federal funds and the requirement that 80% of the employees must be residents of Indiana causes the loss of the federal funds as determined by the federal agency providing the funds, the preference does not apply. Prohibits certain governmental actions when the preference does not apply. Requires any covered entity to prepare an annual report for the public and the legislative council stating, for the contractors awarded public works contracts by the state and the subcontractors with which these contractors entered into subcontracts, the percentage of the contractors' and subcontractors' employees working on the public works contracts who are residents of Indiana. Allows the hiring authority of a city, county, or township to give a preference in hiring for police and fire department positions to: (1) a police officer or firefighter laid off by a city; (2) a county police officer laid off by a sheriff's department; or (3) a person who was employed full-time or part-time by a township to provide fire protection and emergency services and has been laid off by the township. Provides that a laid off police officer or firefighter may not receive the preference unless the person applies for employment and meets all of the employment requirements established by law and the hiring authority.
Title
Hiring preferences.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Senators Lanane, Tallian, Rogers and Hume added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Broden added as cosponsor | |
2010-01-19 | Senators Bray and Waltz added as cosponsors | |
2010-01-14 | Senator Errington added as cosponsor | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-11 | Representatives Tyler and Austin added as coauthors | |
2010-01-11 | Senate sponsors: Senators Waterman and Skinner | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-11 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 9: Yeas 61, Nays 38 | |
2010-01-07 | Amendment 3 (VanHaaften), withdrawn | |
2010-01-07 | Amendment 2 (Kersey), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-07 | Amendment 1 (Davis), ruled out of order | |
2010-01-07 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-05 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2009-11-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-11-17 | Authored by Representative Kersey |