IN HB1001 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Senator Mishler added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that if the acquisition cost of a taxpayer's business personal property in a county is less than $20,000 for a particular assessment date in 2016 or later: (1) the taxpayer is not required to file a personal property return for the taxpayer's business personal property in the county for that assessment date; and (2) the taxpayer's business personal property in the county is exempt from taxation for that assessment date. Specifies that this exemption does not apply to mobile homes assessed as personal property, personal property held as an investment, or personal property that is owned by certain utilities subject to regulation by the utility regulatory commission and is assessed as utility property. Requires the taxpayer to file an annual certification with the county assessor. Provides that the tax rate for certain tax increment financing areas shall be calculated as if this exemption were not in effect. Allows a designating body to grant a property tax abatement under the existing abatement laws for new business personal property that has an acquisition cost of at least $3,000,000. Specifies that if an abatement is granted for such new business personal property for a taxpayer: (1) the abatement may not exceed 20 years (rather than the standard 10 year limit on the abatement); (2) the percentage amount of the abatement deduction must be the same for all years in which the abatement is allowed; and (3) the designating body may waive the application of minimum valuation rules to that new business personal property for specified assessment dates or for all assessment dates after the installation of the new business personal property (and the waiver of the minimum valuation continues to apply to the property, regardless of whether the abatement ordinance is

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 100102 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 100101 (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-06SenateSenator Mishler added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Charbonneau added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Skinner added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Kenley added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Tallian added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Hershman added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Stemler added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Pryor added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Niezgodski added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Klinker added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Kersey added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Goodin added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Candelaria Reardon added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative T. Brown added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Braun added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Porter added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Turner added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 276: yeas 33 and nays 15
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-03SenateSenator Kruse added third sponsor.
2014-02-27SenateHB 1001 Amendment #1 (Stoops), failed.
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Kenley added second sponsor.
2014-02-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy
2014-01-30HouseSenator Hershman added as sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-30HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 121: yeas 63 and nays 33
2014-01-29HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-29HouseHB 1001 Amendment #6 (Porter), failed.
2014-01-27HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-13HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
2014-01-13HouseCoauthored by Representatives Brown T, Braun, Huston
2014-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Turner.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1001/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/5/e/2f5ede27/HB1001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/d/2/ddd24a14/HB1001.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/b/b/4bbb3293/HB1001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/8/8/2688e8a3/HB1001.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/c/c/8bccd474/HB1001.03.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/8/e/4a8eb27b/HB1001.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/3/4/c734a7f7/HB1001.02.COMH.114.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/8/2/91827c5a/HB1001.02.COMH.121.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/8/6/f78668ab/HB1001.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/6/2/a262bed5/HB1001.03.COMS.249.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/8/e/608e21d2/HB1001.03.COMS.276.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback