IL SR2013 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the United States Congress to pass the Butch Lewis Act, which would create the Pension Rehabilitation Administration, an agency of the United States Department of the Treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PASS BUTCH LEWIS ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-11-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-11-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-11-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-11-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-11-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-07SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback