IL SR2013 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to pass the Butch Lewis Act, which would create the Pension Rehabilitation Administration, an agency of the United States Department of the Treasury.
Title
PASS BUTCH LEWIS ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2013&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR2013.htm |