IL SR1780 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares June 13, 2018 as "Suicide Awareness Day" in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUICIDE AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateResolution Adopted
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-28SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-05-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback