IL SR1775 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports the Nutrient Loss Reduction Strategy and the work of stakeholders on the continued implementation of the Strategy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NUTRIENT LOSS REDUCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback