IL SR1752 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted; 032-014-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted; 032-014-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Affirms our support for protecting and advancing the constitutional rights and equitable treatment of all and our opposition to discrimination, prejudice, homophobia, and transphobia. Strongly urges the North Carolina General Assembly to repeal the "Public Facilities Privacy & Security Act" and for the Mississippi Legislature to repeal the "Protecting Freedom of Conscience from Government Discrimination Act" at the earliest opportunity. Encourages all businesses providing public accommodations in North Carolina and Mississippi to demonstrate their support for the dignity of all people by openly welcoming LGBT people to their places of business and by providing gender non-specific bathroom facilities for their customers and employees wherever practicable. Urges the Governor to prohibit all non-essential State travel to North Carolina and Mississippi until those states take the proper measures to repeal these laws.
Title
NC/MS - REPEAL ANTI-LGBT LAWS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 032-014-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 006-001-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Human Services |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |