IL SR1746 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges that all proposed Illinois rail projects with new freight train holding tracks adjacent to residential areas, including the current Chicago-Milwaukee Intercity Passenger Rail Program described above have a full Environmental Impact Statement. Urges the Illinois Department of Transportation to pursue options to eliminate or minimize the routing of bypass freight traffic through the Chicago metropolitan area, including prioritizing the review and study of rail bypass systems around Chicago that would ensure coastal rail traffic not destined for Chicago could more efficiently bypass the Chicago region and significantly reduce the negative impacts of freight rail in the highest populated areas of Illinois.
Title
ILL RAIL PROJECTS-IMPACT STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |