IL SR1703 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May 9, 2018 as "Loyola University Chicago Day".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOYOLA UNIVERSITY CHICAGO DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-08SenateResolution Adopted
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback