IL SR1668 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April of 2018 as "Second Chance Month".
Title
SECOND CHANCE MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1668&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1668.htm |