IL SR1668 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April of 2018 as "Second Chance Month".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SECOND CHANCE MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateResolution Adopted
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateBe Adopted State Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback