IL SR1647 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes that there are significant disparities in college degree completion rates for low-income and first generation college students and students of color at institutions across the State. Commits to closing statewide racial and socioeconomic degree attainment gaps and institutional achievement gaps and encourages institutions of higher education to implement and expand existing student success efforts that have evidence of improving educational outcomes for low-income and first generation college students and students of color. Urges the State's P20 Council is to update the State's 60 by 25 goal to include equity-focused targets aimed at closing institutional racial and socioeconomic achievement gaps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COLLEGE COMPLETION RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateBe Adopted Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback