IL SR1647 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes that there are significant disparities in college degree completion rates for low-income and first generation college students and students of color at institutions across the State. Commits to closing statewide racial and socioeconomic degree attainment gaps and institutional achievement gaps and encourages institutions of higher education to implement and expand existing student success efforts that have evidence of improving educational outcomes for low-income and first generation college students and students of color. Urges the State's P20 Council is to update the State's 60 by 25 goal to include equity-focused targets aimed at closing institutional racial and socioeconomic achievement gaps.
Title
COLLEGE COMPLETION RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1647&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1647.htm |