IL SR1600 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Illinois agencies to take action to protect against the loss of water resources and flooding and ecological impacts from Foxconn Technology Group's facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROTECT WATER RESOURCES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateResolution Adopted
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateBe Adopted as Amended Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2018-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback