IL SR1600 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Illinois agencies to take action to protect against the loss of water resources and flooding and ecological impacts from Foxconn Technology Group's facility.
Title
PROTECT WATER RESOURCES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |