IL SR1590 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States the belief that the Illinois Constitution should not be amended to permit a graduated income tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GRADUATED INCOME TAX-OPPOSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback