IL SR1561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, the Illinois Department of Human Rights, and the Illinois Department of Labor to investigate the culture of harassment at Ford's Illinois plants, and provide increased support for the brave women who have come forward to make their voices heard. Calls upon the Governor of Illinois to review all state contracts with Ford Motor Company for compliance with the Illinois Human Rights Act, the Illinois Procurement Code, and other laws and regulations governing state contractors. Calls upon the National Labor Relations Board, the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, the Illinois Department of Human Rights, and the Illinois Department of Labor to investigate UAW's role in facilitating the harassment at Ford's Illinois plants, including whether it breached its duty of fair representation to union members who were victims of harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FORD SEXUAL HARASSMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateResolution Adopted
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateBe Adopted Labor; 014-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback