IL SR1516 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the fourth week of April 2018 as "Illinois Distracted Driving Awareness Week".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISTRACTED DRIVING WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateResolution Adopted
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateBe Adopted Transportation; 012-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback