IL SR1413 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States the opinion of the Illinois Senate that the proposed educational pension cost shift from the State of Illinois to local school districts, community colleges, and institutions of higher education is financially wrong.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION PENSION COST SHIFT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateBe Adopted as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback