IL SR1413 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States the opinion of the Illinois Senate that the proposed educational pension cost shift from the State of Illinois to local school districts, community colleges, and institutions of higher education is financially wrong.
Title
EDUCATION PENSION COST SHIFT
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. John Curran [R] |
Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |