IL SR1408 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Declares March 1-7, 2018 as KCNQ2 Encephalopathy Awareness Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENCEPHALOPATHY AWARENESS WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateResolution Adopted
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateBe Adopted as Amended Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback