IL SR1407 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Condemns the legislation signed by Polish President Andrzej Duda that would impose jail terms for suggesting that the country of Poland was complicit in the crimes against humanity committed on Polish soil during the Holocaust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLISH HOLOCAUST LEGISLATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateBe Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback