IL SR1394 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 21, 2018 as "Magic Day in Monmouth".
Title
MAGIC DAY IN MONMOUTH
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Be Adopted Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1394&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1394.htm |