IL SR1371 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the month of March of 2018 as Social Work Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOCIAL WORK MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateResolution Adopted
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateBe Adopted Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback