IL SR1362 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April 10, 2018 as Pay Equity Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAY EQUITY DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateResolution Adopted
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateBe Adopted Labor; 015-000-000
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback