IL SR1332 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 27, 2018, the 26th anniversary of the passing of Rabbi Menachem Mendel Schneerson, the Lubavitcher Rebbe, as "Education and Sharing Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
EDUCATION & SHARING DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |