IL SR1301 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 24, 2018 as "Lyme Disease Awareness Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
LYME DISEASE AWARENESS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |