IL SR1293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares June 25, 2018 as "Living Kidney Donors Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
LIVING KIDNEY DONORS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1293&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1293.htm |