IL SR1242 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes President Ronald Reagan and requests a statue be placed in the Illinois State Capitol Building or on the surrounding grounds in his honor.
Title
RECOGNIZES - PRES REAGAN
Sponsors
Sen. Darin LaHood [R] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. William McCann [R] |
Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1242&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SR/09800SR1242.htm |