IL SR1186 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Performance audit of the Department of Veterans Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERFORM AUDIT DEPT OF V.A.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-15SenateResolution Adopted; 048-000-000
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions January 31, 2018
2018-01-30SenateBe Adopted Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback