IL SR1153 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to support funding for the research of Lyme disease and to further promote awareness of the effects of Lyme disease in the United States.
Title
LYME DISEASE AWARENESS-FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1153&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1153.htm |