IL SR1076 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-10)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Senate Task Force on Sexual Discrimination and Harassment Awareness and Prevention. Directs the Task Force to conduct a comprehensive review of the legal and social consequences of sexual discrimination and harassment, in both the public and private sectors, and to study and make recommendations on combating sexual discrimination and harassment in Illinois, including in workplaces, in educational institutions, and in state and local government. Provides for the composition of the Task Force, and for appointment of members (who shall serve without compensation) within 10 days after the adoption of this resolution. Requires the Task Force to hold its initial meeting no later than December 15, 2017, and to report its recommendations, including proposed legislation and administrative rule changes no later than December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL HARASSMENT TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-07 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-11-07SenateResolution Adopted; 055-000-000
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 7, 2017
2017-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-11-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback